Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Black, Edward K, against Taylor, Mary K, represented by Black, Edward K, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 21, 2016 ORDER TO VACATE SIGNED BY JUDGE W. CARPENTER ON 09-20-2016. THE LIABILITY WAS DETERMINDED TO BE DUE TO IDENTIFY THEFT; NO BALANCE IS DUE. ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 59587182 ORDER |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 17, 2016 MOTION AND ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT - MARY K TAYLOR ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 59570716 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 59496861 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: MARY K TAYLOR JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $949.30 INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.