Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brereton, Diane, Minton, Theresa, Bumbarger, Connie, Harris, Barbara, Bitto, Natalie, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Pelvic Mesh case represented by Rogin, Alexandra D, Forcier, Justin M, Hrubiec, R. Joseph, Shields, Colleen D, Heisman, James D, (total of 5) See All against Astora Womens Health Inc, Astora Womens Health Llc, American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women'S Health Inc, Astora Women'S Health Llc, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, PELVIC MESH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, PELVIC MESH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryPelvic Mesh |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 23, 2020 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 65710122 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 23, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF JUSTIN M. FORCIER, ESQ. (WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 65710122 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 4, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 63490169 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF COLLEEN D. SHIELDS, ESQUIRE, AND ALEXANDRA D. ROGIN, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION, WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 61054042 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-04-2017 13:00 ASTORA WOMENS HEALTH INC ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 60952645 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-04-2017 13:00 ASTORA WOMENS HEALTH LLC ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 60952643 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 9, 2017 ENTITY: AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. SERVED AMENDED UPON LYNANNE GARES, A REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, ON 8/4/2017 AT 12:05 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60952641 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-04-2017 13:00 AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDINGS INC ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 60952646 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 9, 2017 ENTITY: AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC. SERVED AMENDED UPON LYNANNE GARES, A REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY, ON 8/4/2017 AT 12:05 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60952642 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2017 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-04-2017 13:00 ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 60952650 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.