Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Neely, Timothy, filed a(n) Petition Return Of Property case against State Of Delaware, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryPetition Return Of Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISCELLANEOUS CASES) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2016 STIPULATED ORDER SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER MANNING AT RETURN OF PROPERTY CALL ON 8-18-16. ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 59455623 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 12, 2016 LETTER FROM SHARON AGNEW TO LITIGANTS DATED AUGUST 10, 2016. THIS IS TO ADVISE THAT THERE WILL BE A SPECIAL CALL OF THE RETURN OF PROPERTY CALENDAR ON THURSDAY, AUGUST 18, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 59403857 LETTER |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR PER AG'S REQUEST DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 16, 2016 MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 16, 2016 LETTER TO DEIDRE SADLER- CREW IN REGARDS TO REMOVING THE MOTION TO COMPEL FROM THE CALENDAR SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 11, 2016 ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 58719438 LETTER |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL SCHEDULED FOR: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2016 MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FORFEITURE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 58667655 MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 13, 2016 NOTICE OF SERVICE TO TIMOTHY NEELY- 2ND DEMAND- STATE'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 58565133 NOTICE SRV OF INTERROGATORIES |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 8, 2016 NOTICE OF SERVICE TO TIMOTHY NEELY- STATE'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 58366969 NOTICE SRV OF INTERROGATORIES |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2015 PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: VRR TRANSACTION ID: 58351728 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - PETITION RETURN OF PROPERTY DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2015 PETITION PRO SE RETURN OF PROPERTY FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON DECEMBER 23, 2015. ACCEPTED BY: VRR TRANSACTION ID: 58351728 MISC-PET RETURN OF PROPERTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.