Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Williams, Reginald E, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Freibott, Frederick S, against Hopkins, Latisha M, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with ROCANELLI, ANDREA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROCANELLI, ANDREA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL CODE ADDED DURING CASE CLEAN UP CASE CLOSED ON FEBRUARY 15, 2016 DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 6, 2017 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
February 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2016 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 58574727 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 3, 2016 LETTER TO COUNSEL. LETTER TO COUNSEL. A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, OR A LETTER STATING THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER, IS DUE WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS LETTER. ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 58512071 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 30, 2016 SERVED NON EST. LATISHA M. HOPKINS ON 1-20-16. REASON: MOVED NEW TENANT LIVES THERE. RETURNED TO PROTHONOTARY OFFICE ON 1-25-16. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 58491255 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 21, 2016 LETTER TO JUDGE ROCANELLI FROM FREDERICK S. FREIBOTT ADVISING THAT THIS MATTER RESOLVED AND A NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED IN THE NEAR FUTURE. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 58452452 LETTER |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 16, 2016 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 1-11-16. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 58435300 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2016 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES RULE 3H STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 58356226 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2016 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.