Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bloutt, Marcus E, Blount, Eugenia Y, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Radulski, Erin K, Rhoades, Joseph J, against Green, Natascha A, Government Employees Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with DAVIS, ERIC M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVIS, ERIC M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 28, 2017 ORDER - STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. IT IS SO ORDERED, DVAIS, J. MARCH 24, 2017. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60389563 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 27, 2017 CASE SETTLED |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2017 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60379006 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 21, 2017 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER SENT TO COUNSEL ON MARCH 20, 2017. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60360424 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 19, 2017 LETTER TO THE HONORABLE ERIC M. DAVIS ADVISING CASE HAS SETTLED ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60353281 LETTER |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 28, 2017 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR WEDNESDAY, APRIL 5, 2017 AT 12:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 60127230 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: DAVIS, ERIC M TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. JURY TRIAL: 03-26-2018; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: 03-14-2018. ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 59487939 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2016 LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING |
|
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
E-MAIL FILED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 20, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: DAVIS, ERIC M EMAIL FROM CHAMBERS TO COUNSEL: TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR THREE DAYS TO BEGIN ON 03-26-2018. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 59448907 E-MAIL FILED |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 26, 2016 CLERK'S PROCEEDING SHEET FROM PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST NATASCHA A. GREEN GRANTED BY DAVIS, J. ON 4-25-16. ACCEPTED BY: NDM TRANSACTION ID: 58909084 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.