Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Soverign Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Aulgur Jr., Robert T, against Maxwell, Darrell Ann, Maxwell Jr, Charles L, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JOHNSTON, MARY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHNSTON, MARY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 24, 2011 NON EST AS TO DEFENDANT CHARLES MAXWELL, JR. ON JANUARY 21, 2011. PER EMAIL FROM ATTY DATED JANUARY 17, 2011. PLEASE DO NOT ATTEMPT SERVICE ON THE ABOVE. PLEASE DO NOT POST THE PROPERTY. THE LOAN HAS BEEN BROUGHT CURRENT. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 36104633 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 20, 2011 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 35402842 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
January 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 16, 2011 2 WRITS ISSUED JANUARY 14 2011 ACCEPTED BY: LM TRANSACTION ID: 35399738 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2011 INIT FILING MORTGAGE |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2011 FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT PRAECIPE SUMMONS CIS SHEET EXHIBIT A EXHIBIT B ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 35133458 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.