Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Harley-Davidson Financial Services, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kerrick, Daniel C, against Smith, Allan P, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with SCOTT JR, CALVIN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCOTT JR, CALVIN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryReplevin |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS - FULL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 15, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: SCOTT, CALVIN L -- ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 48442001 TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS: FULL |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 22, 2012 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: ALLAN P SMITH JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: PRINCIPAL $9506.60 INT @ ANNUAL RATE 20.99% FROM 7/16/09 ATTORNEY FEES $450.00 AND COURT COSTS TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $9506.60 PLAINTIFF HARLEY-DAVIDSON'S DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ALLAN P. SMITH AFFIDAVIT TO PLAINTIFF HARLEY-DAVIDSON'S DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ALLAN P. SMITH ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 47872647 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
41E NOTICE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 10, 2012 [DATED: OCTOBER 9, 2012] 41(E) NOTICE SENT TO COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 46871742 41E NOTICE LETTER |
|
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2011 (1) REPLEVIN RETURNED - NON EST INVENTUS AS TO ALLAN P. SMITH ON 5-26-11. (8) ATTEMPTS. PROTHONOTARY FILED ON 5-27-11 ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 37842594 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2011 WRIT ISSUED TO NCC SHERIFF ON 5-3-11 REGARDING ALLAN P. SMITH, CHECK #4141, $30.00 ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 37412073 WRIT ISSUED |
|
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 28, 2011 PRAECIPE ON WRIT OF REPLEVIN WRIT OF REPLEVIN ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 37199583 PRAECIPE FILED |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 25, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: SCOTT, CALVIN L SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN) ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 36127617 ORDER |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 4, 2011 (1) REPLEVIN RETURNED - SERVED ALLAN P. SMITH PERSONALLY ON 1-24-11. RETURNED ON 1-26-11. ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 35721519 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 20, 2011 ORDER - REPELVIN HEARING WILL BE HELD TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 22, 2011 AT 9:00 A.M. IN THE NEW CASTLE COUNTY COURT HOUSE SO ORDERED BY SCOTT, J. ON 1-13-11. ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 35439256 ORDER |
|
January 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 16, 2011 1 WRIT ISSUED JANUARY 14 2011 ACCEPTED BY: LM TRANSACTION ID: 35399700 WRIT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.