Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Morgan Campbell, Shelly Ann, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with WITHAM JR., WILLIAM L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2014 |
CategoryAppointment Of Guardianship |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 16, 2015 PETITIONER SHELLY ANN MORGAN CAMPBELL'S CERTIFICATION OF OPENING OF ACCOUNT EXHIBIT A TO PETITIONER'S CERTIFICATION OF OPENING OF ACCOUNT - PROOF OF OPENING OF ACCOUNT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 56600652 NOTICE |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 7, 2015 ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF THE PROPERTY OF A MINOR WITH AUTHORITY TO SETTLE A TORT CLAIM ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 56551635 ORDER |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANSHIP DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 20, 2014 PETITION OF SHELLY ANN MORGAN CAMPBELL FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF A PERSONAL INJURY CLAIM OF KALISA R. CHAMBERS, A MINOR NOTICE OF PETITION OF SHELLY ANN MORGAN CAMPBELL - AT COURT'S EARLIEST CONVENIENCE EXHIBIT A - MINOR'S BIRTH CERTIFICATE EXHIBIT B - PETITIONER'S AFFIDAVIT - SHELLY ANN MORGAN CAMPBELL EXHIBIT C - MINOR'S MEDICAL RECORDS PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 56451736 MISC-APPT OF GUARDIANSHIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.