Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barnett, Thomas D, Conway, Daniel T, against Mercado, Yadira M, Ramos, Luis J, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with YOUNG, ROBERT B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 21, 2017 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 16, 2016 LETTER FROM THOMAS D.H. BARNETT, ESQUIRE TO THE JUDICIAL CASE MANAGER REQUESTING THAT THIS MATTER BE PLACED ON THE MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DORMANT DOCKET ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 59279409 LETTER |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
41E NOTICE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 17, 2016 LETTER - 41E NOTICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 59155289 41E NOTICE LETTER |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 1, 2015 LISA R. HATFIELD, ESQUIRE WITHDRAWS HER APPEARANCE AND DANIEL T. CONWAY, ESQUIRE OF ATLANTIC LAW GROUP, LLC ENTERS HIS APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 57941661 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: MAY 10, 2015 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (CONTINUING CONFERENCE) - THE PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO A TRIAL MORTGAGE MODIFICATION, WHICH MUST BE VERIFIED BEFORE ANY JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF WILL SEEK TO DISMISS THE FORECLOSURE ACTION UPON THE CONVERSION OF THE TRIAL MODIFICATION TO A PERMANENT MODIFICATION BY FILING A NOTICE OR STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR BY MOVING THE COURT FOR DISMISSAL, AS APPROPRIATE, NO LATER THAN 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SUCH CONVERSION. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 57205684 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2015 MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 57104098 MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 15, 2015 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (CONTINUING CONFERENCE) - AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MAY 6, 2015 AT 9:00 AM; MEDIATION FEE: DUE BUT NOT PAID. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 57074143 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION (NO FEE) DATE DOCKETED: **ODP_GENERAL_DATE_DDMONYYY CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION. THE BORROWER ELECTS TO PARTICIPATE. ANA SUAREZ, HOUSING COUNSELOR. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 56963355 CERTIFICATE PARTICIPATION PA |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2015 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (INITIAL CONFERENCE) - AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 13, 2015 AT 9:30 AM; MEDIATION FEE: DUE BUT NOT PAID. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 56858988 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 14, 2015 AFFIDAVIT OF LISA R. HATFIELD, NOTICE TO TENANTS AND LIENHOLDERS OF FORECLOSURE ACTION ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 56771656 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.