Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Prouse, Karla L, Prouse, John L, represented by Charlton, Janet Z, Conway, Daniel T, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with GREEN-STREETT, RENETA L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2016 SALE BUY BACK 05-05-2016 10:00 JOHN L. PROUSE ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 59495886 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2016 SALE BUY BACK 05-05-2016 10:00 JOHN L. PROUSE ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 59489569 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 28, 2016 AFFIDAVIT OF JANET Z. CHARLTON - PROOF OF MAILING - RULE 69 (G) EXHIBIT A TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JANET Z. CHARLTON - NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE EXHIBIT B TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JANET Z. CHARLTON - CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS EXHIBIT C TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF JANET Z. CHARLTON - AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 58918035 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 27, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: FREUD, ANDREA MAYBEE LEV FAC SENT TO KENT COUNTY SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 58636790 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2016 LEVARI FACIAS ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 58591549 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2016 PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 58591549 PRAECIPE FILED |
|
September 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 19, 2015 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: JOHN L PROUSE KARLA L PROUSE JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: PRINCIPAL $196362.90 INTEREST $15840.00 ESCROW BALANCE $2492.15 MIP $79.46 ADDITIONAL COSTS $3261.57 ATTORNEYS FEES @ 5% $10610.15 PLUS ALL OTHER COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ACTION TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $228646.23 DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT STATEMENT OF AMOUNT DUE AFFIDAVIT OF JANET Z. CHARLTON EXHIBIT A - SCRA SEARCH RESULTS ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 57884297 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 10, 2015 AFFIDAVIT OF JANET Z. CHARLTON TO THE NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS - PROOF OF MAILING - RULE 4(F)4 EXHIBIT A - NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS AND TENANT OF FORECLOSURE ACTION EXHIBIT B - CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS EXHIBIT C - USPS CONFIRMATION EXHIBIT D - AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING ACCEPTED BY: MPF TRANSACTION ID: 57834658 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT LOSS MITIGATION DATE DOCKETED: JULY 21, 2015 AFFIDAVIT OF LOSS MITIGATION ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 57577629 AFFIDAVIT LOSS MITIGATION |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 22, 2015 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 57275522 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.