Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Connell, Ryan P, against Mosley, Loretta T, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with WITHAM JR., WILLIAM L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2015 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - LORETTA T MOSLEY ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 56747982 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 8, 2015 TAX WARRANT - LORETTA T MOSLEY ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 56561152 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 18, 2014 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: LORETTA T MOSLEY JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: TAX IN THE AMOUNT OF $119.00 PENALTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $7.14 INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $3.70 INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 18, 2014 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 56473508 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.