Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Harper, Jeremy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Skiles, Nicholas E, Sutton, Jennifer A, Chasanov, Shae L, Fletcher Jr., William D, against Lima, Mauricio A, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with WITHAM JR., WILLIAM L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 7, 2016 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 59099263 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 26, 2016 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 59057345 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED: SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 25, 2016 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 20, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: WITHAM, WILLIAM L SO ORDERED (LETTER TO JUDGE WITHAM RE: COURTESY COPY OF PRE-TRIAL STIP EXTENSION) ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 59028373 ORDER |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 20, 2016 LETTER TO JUDGE WITHAM ADVISING SETTLEMENT OF CASE AND REQUESTING THE CASE BE REMOVE FROM HIS TRIAL CALENDAR ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 59027356 LETTER |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 18, 2016 LETTER TO JUDGE WITHAM RE: COURTESY COPY OF PRE-TRIAL STIP EXTENSION ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 59019385 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 11, 2015 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY REGARDING JONATHAN KATES, MD ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 58141808 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 16, 2015 AFFIDAVIT OF JEREMY HARPER FOR INTERROGATORY ANSWERS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF JEREMY HARPER FOR INTERROGATORY ANSWERS ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 57248528 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2015 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCITON ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 57177066 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 17, 2015 DEFENDANT MAURICIO A. LIMA'S RENOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JEREMY HARPER FOR JULY 21, 2015 AT 3:00 PM CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 57089881 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.