Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Clark, Mildred Viola, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Segletes Iii, Theodore J, Crawford, William A, Fletcher Jr., William D, against Food Lion Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with YOUNG, ROBERT B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 14, 2016 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 58852772 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED: SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2016 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2016 LETTER - CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 58667846 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 3, 2016 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 58508420 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 22, 2016 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION FOR USE AT TRIAL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION FOR USE AT TRIAL ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 58461916 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 21, 2016 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF JAMES KING FOR THURSDAY, JANUARY 21, 2016 AT 3:00 P.M. CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE OF RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF JAMES KING FOR THURSDAY, JANUARY 21, 2016 AT 3:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 58450346 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 8, 2016 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF THE CUSTODIANS OF RECORD FOR CARDIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, DELAWARE BACK PAIN AND SPORTS REHABILITATION, DR. GLEN ROWE, DR. ERIC SCHWARTZ, BAYHEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, DR. GEORGE SCHREPPLER, BAYHEALTH ORTHOPEDICS AND REHABILITATION, AND DR. STEPHEN PENNY (FOR FEBRUARY 20, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M.) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM ACCEPTED BY: MPF TRANSACTION ID: 58390944 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2015 ORDER SIGNED BY: YOUNG, ROBERT B SO ORDERED (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 58349524 ORDER |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2015 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 58344678 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 18, 2015 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF JAMES KING CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE OF RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF JAMES KING ACCEPTED BY: MPF TRANSACTION ID: 58310919 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.