Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Davis, Haley M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clifton, Miranda D, Chambers, Scott E, against Wykpisz, Stanley J, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with WITHAM JR., WILLIAM L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2014 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 2, 2017 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 14, 2016 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 58423647 NOTICE |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED: SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 7, 2016 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 6, 2016 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 58375358 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 6, 2015 RESCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR TUESDAY, JANUARY 5, 2016 AT 11:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: MPF TRANSACTION ID: 58121208 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 9, 2015 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR MONDAY, AUGUST 10, 2015 AT 1:30 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 57353219 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 5, 2015 RENOTICE OF THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT STANLEY J. WYKPISZ SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 19, 2015 AT 1:00 P.M. AND THE NOTICE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 57336980 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR TRIAL FEE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 7, 2015 REQUEST FOR TRIAL |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 25, 2015 SUBPOENA SERVED BY CURT GRUBER, INVESTIGATOR FOR SCHMITTINGER AND RODRIGUEZ, UPON JASMINE ODOM ACCEPTED BY: MPF TRANSACTION ID: 57133894 SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2015 SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: MSC TRANSACTION ID: 57106237 SCHEDULING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.