Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dahlink Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Kingery, Clark C, against Foraker, Angela C, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with WITHAM JR., WILLIAM L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWITHAM JR., WILLIAM L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryJustice Of The Peace Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM CLARK KINGERY TO ANNETTE ASHLEY TO SATISFY THE JUDGMENT THIS JUDGMENT IS FULLY PAID AND SATISFIED THIS 17TH DAY OF JULY, 2015. SO SAITH: POA- C. KINGERY DATE DOCKETED: JULY 18, 2015 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (POA) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 57565516 DATE DOCKETED: JULY 21, 2015 POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM CLARK C. KINGERY, ESQUIRE AUTHORIZING ANNETTE ASHLEY, PROTHONOTARY, TO SATISFY JUDGMENT. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 57571283 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 28, 2015 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 21, 2012 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: ANGELA C FORAKER JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $9839.37 POST JUDGMENT INTEREST @ 5.75% FROM 08/02/2012 INIT FILING JP COURT |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 21, 2012 JUDGMENT TRANSFER FROM THE JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT TO TRANSFER JUDGMENT TO SUPERIOR COURT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 48519806 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.