Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with GREEN-STREETT, RENETA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREEN-STREETT, RENETA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
________________ SCHEDULED, REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 28, 2022 EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 26, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: GREEN-STREETT, RENETA L SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67503639 ORDER |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 23, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67500684 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED: SETTLED PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 28, 2022 TRL SCHD: SETTLED PRIOR TRIAL |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 1, 2022 LETTER TO COURT RE: CASE HAS SETTLED ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67348170 LETTER |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF, TO BE SERVED PRIVATELY. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67272560 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2022 DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67272579 DISCOVERY |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 27, 2022 DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND DECLARATION ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67264285 NOTICE SRV ANS INTERROGATORIES |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 12, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES, RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (VIA FIRST CLASS MAIL) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67225297 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 6, 2022 SCHEDULING ORDER - PTC: 2-22-2023; TCC: 3-24-2023; 3 DAY JURY TRIAL 3-27-2023 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67210922 SCHEDULING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.