Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kakowski, Brian Eugene filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with HENSON, CAROL L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time22 days |
DV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 01/05/2010 09:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 05, 2010DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 12/31/2009 11:25:00 # Pages:10
Date: December 31, 2009DECLARATION - NOTICE - EX PARTE 12/31/2009 11:28:00 # Pages:1
Date: December 31, 2009DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/31/2009 11:06:00 # Pages:9
Date: December 31, 2009DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 12/31/2009 11:05:00 # Pages:3
Date: December 31, 2009MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 01/22/2010 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 22, 2010FINANCIAL STATEMENT - SIMPLIFIED 12/31/2009 11:28:00 # Pages:86
Date: December 31, 2009SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 01/22/2010 17:07:00 # Pages:2
Date: January 22, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.