Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
This complaint is filed by Glenn A. Besnyl, an attorney at law, on behalf of the plaintiff, National Commercial Recovery, Inc., also known as Blair Smith and Associates. The complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angele...
Complaint - Complaint
Date: April 28, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 28, 2009Certificate of Mailing - Attachment - Notice of Case Management Review-Limited Civil
Date: April 29, 2009(name extension) - Proof of Service by Personal Service
Date: May 21, 2009(name extension) - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 04, 2009(name extension) - Request for Entry of Default (Entered)
Date: June 25, 2009Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: September 03, 2009Declaration (name extension) - Declaration
Date: September 03, 2009Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 03, 2009Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: September 11, 2009Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: September 18, 2009Motion re: (name extension) - Proof of Service
Date: February 02, 2010Minute Order - Minute Order
Date: March 01, 2010Order (name extension) - Order
Date: March 01, 2010(name extension) - Request for Dismissal
Date: October 12, 2010Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Renewal of Judgment
Date: July 08, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: November 19, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)
Date: November 19, 2019Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit of Identity
Date: April 01, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice of Bankruptcy Discharge
Date: April 01, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment | ||
April 22, 2021 | Order (name extension) - Order Approving Additional Names of Judgment Debtor Karina Saucedo For Issuance of Abstract of Judgment | ||
April 01, 2021 | Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit of Identity | ||
April 01, 2021 | Notice (name extension) - Notice of Bankruptcy Discharge | ||
November 19, 2019 | Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling | ||
November 19, 2019 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...) | ||
November 19, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION TO VACATE RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (CCP § 683.170) TENTATIVE RULING: Defendant / Judgment Debtor Karina Saucedo’s Motion to Vacate the Renewal of Judgment is DENIED. OPPOSITION: Filed September 11, ...
Judge: James E. Blancarte or Serena R. Murillo |
|
September 24, 2019 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...) | ||
September 24, 2019 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...) of 09/24/2019 | ||
September 24, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
There being no judge available this date, the motion to set aside/vacate default and default judgment scheduled for 9/24/2019 is continued to 11/19/19 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at Stanley Mosk Cour...
Judge: James E. Blancarte or Serena R. Murillo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.