Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of Colorado, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Diaz, Victor, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryRegistration - Out Of State Su |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time1188 days |
NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (GOVT) 11/21/2011 13:32:00 # Pages:2
Date: November 21, 2011NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (GOVT) 12/31/2009 15:01:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (GOVT) 12/31/2009 14:22:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00REGISTRATION - OUT-OF-STATE CUSTODY ORDER 12/31/2009 14:59:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00OTHER 12/31/2009 15:02:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER 12/31/2009 14:21:00 # Pages:11
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 11/30/2011 13:32:00 # Pages:1
Date: November 30, 2011CERTIFICATE - SERVICE BY MAIL 10/26/2011 08:54:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONTEMPT 01/12/2012 13:31:00 # Pages:3
Date: January 12, 2012NOTICE - OTHER 02/01/2013 13:26:00 # Pages:2
Date: February 01, 2013EX PARTE APPLICATION - TRANSFER ORDER (UIFSA) 10/26/2011 13:33:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00REPORT - REGISTRATION 12/31/2009 14:21:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - REGISTRATION OF OUT-OF-STATE SUPPORT ORDER 12/31/2009 13:35:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 11/03/2011 15:23:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2011-11-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 11/30/2011 13:31:00 # Pages:1
Date: November 30, 2011CERTIFICATE - SERVICE BY MAIL 10/26/2011 13:33:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00TRANSFER - MAIL RECEIPT 04/02/2013 08:03:00 # Pages:1
Date: April 02, 2013NOTICE - OTHER 10/26/2011 13:33:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00RECEIPT - OTHER 11/10/2011 01:00:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2011-11-10T00:00:00OTHER 12/31/2009 15:02:00 # Pages:11
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 02/01/2013 13:28:00 DATED 03/20/12 # Pages:1
Date: February 01, 2013NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT 12/31/2009 15:01:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT 12/31/2009 14:22:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT 11/21/2011 13:32:00 # Pages:2
Date: November 21, 2011NOTICE - OTHER 02/01/2013 13:28:00 # Pages:1
Date: February 01, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.