Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ashley, Laura L, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Delong, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryRegistration - Ca Support |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 06/10/2010 16:07:00 # Pages:3
Date: June 10, 2010STIPULATION & ORDER (GOVERNMENTAL) 12/31/2009 15:58:00 # Pages:5
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT 12/31/2009 15:58:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00MOTION - MODIFICATION 01/22/2010 13:58:00 TELEPHONIC # Pages:4
Date: 2010-01-22T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER 04/26/2010 15:35:00 # Pages:3
Date: April 26, 2010NOTICE - PRODUCE AND APPEAR 01/22/2010 13:58:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2010-01-22T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/05/2010 09:33:00 # Pages:4
Date: April 05, 2010NOTICE - REGISTRATION OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER 12/31/2009 15:58:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/05/2010 12:05:00 # Pages:4
Date: April 05, 2010MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 04/05/2010 14:00:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2010-04-05T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/26/2010 15:35:00 # Pages:4
Date: April 26, 2010MINUTE ORDER 06/10/2010 09:30:00 # Pages:2
Date: June 10, 2010STATEMENT - DECISION 06/10/2010 16:25:00 DECISION OF THE COURT # Pages:11
Date: June 10, 2010RESPONSE - GOVT NOTICE OF MOTION / OSC 04/26/2010 15:35:00 # Pages:2
Date: April 26, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.