Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
County Of Orange, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by County Of Orange, against Eldridge, Chimilya, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2009 |
CategoryPaternity - Department Of Chil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions99 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypePaternity |
|
Case Cycle Time1909 days |
JUDGMENT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 01/07/2010 11:15:00 # Pages:8
Date: January 07, 2010SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 09/30/2009 00:00:00 # Pages:14
Date: September 30, 2009STIPULATION & ORDER (GOVERNMENTAL) 12/22/2014 09:04:00 # Pages:9
Date: December 22, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 01/07/2010 11:15:00 # Pages:2
Date: January 07, 2010REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT (GOVT) 01/07/2010 11:15:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 07, 2010REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT - GOVT 01/07/2010 11:15:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 07, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.