Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
County Of Orange, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by County Of Orange, against Kaddoura, Sultan, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2009 |
CategoryPaternity - Department Of Chil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions141 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypePaternity |
|
Case Cycle Time141 days |
REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT (GOVT) 02/18/2010 13:56:00 # Pages:1
Date: February 18, 2010JUDGMENT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 02/18/2010 13:57:00 # Pages:8
Date: February 18, 2010DECLARATION - AMENDED PROPOSED JUDGMENT 01/12/2010 13:55:00 # Pages:10
Date: January 12, 2010DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 02/18/2010 13:57:00 # Pages:1
Date: February 18, 2010SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 09/30/2009 00:00:00 # Pages:14
Date: September 30, 2009DECLARATION - OTHER 02/18/2010 13:57:00 # Pages:1
Date: February 18, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 02/18/2010 13:56:00 # Pages:2
Date: February 18, 2010REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT - GOVT 02/18/2010 13:56:00 # Pages:1
Date: February 18, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.