Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gibson, Jeffrey S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gibson, Nicole L, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with MELZER, LAYNE H. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 23, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions796 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time796 days |
MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 01/13/2010 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-01-13T00:00:00OSC - OTHER 12/31/2009 10:34:00 # Pages:8
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/23/2009 09:19:00 # Pages:5
Date: 2009-12-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE 01/21/2010 09:28:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/27/2010 08:27:00 # Pages:15
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 02/16/2010 16:18:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/06/2012 10:03:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 06, 2012MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY COURT 02/10/2010 08:30:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00DECLARATION - NOTICE - EX PARTE 12/23/2009 09:20:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-23T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/31/2009 08:14:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 04/14/2010 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE 01/28/2010 11:04:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-01-28T00:00:00DV REQUEST - CONTINUE COURT HEARING & ISSUE TRO 02/10/2010 12:18:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 12/23/2009 09:20:00 # Pages:7
Date: 2009-12-23T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY COURT 02/10/2010 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 03/06/2012 15:48:00 # Pages:2
Date: March 06, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/02/2010 09:01:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2010-02-02T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/23/2009 09:20:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-12-23T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/27/2010 08:27:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/31/2009 08:14:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 12/31/2009 08:15:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - MATTER TRAILED 02/09/2010 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-02-09T00:00:00SUMMONS 12/31/2009 08:14:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE 01/21/2010 09:41:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00DV REQUEST - CONTINUE COURT HEARING & ISSUE TRO 01/13/2010 09:37:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-01-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/22/2010 09:42:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-02-22T00:00:00RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 02/16/2010 16:17:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 06/02/2010 08:30:00 # Pages:2
Date: June 02, 2010NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 03/09/2010 07:51:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00JUDGMENT 03/06/2012 10:01:00 # Pages:7
Date: March 06, 2012DV REQUEST - CONTINUE COURT HEARING & ISSUE TRO 03/09/2010 10:37:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 03/09/2010 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/06/2012 10:03:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 06, 2012NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/06/2012 10:03:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 06, 2012APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 03/06/2012 10:02:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 06, 2012DV REQUEST - CONTINUE COURT HEARING & ISSUE TRO 04/14/2010 10:26:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.