Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tu, Lindsey, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ly, Huot Sieu, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions142 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time142 days |
DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 09/30/2009 08:11:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/30/2009 08:11:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00SUMMONS 09/30/2009 08:11:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00PROPERTY DECLARATION 01/28/2010 11:42:00 # Pages:2
Date: January 28, 2010INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 01/28/2010 11:42:00 # Pages:4
Date: January 28, 2010PETITION - DISSOLUTION 09/30/2009 08:10:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00JUDGMENT 02/19/2010 16:20:00 # Pages:9
Date: February 19, 2010DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 02/19/2010 16:20:00 # Pages:2
Date: February 19, 2010NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 11/30/2009 08:57:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-11-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/30/2009 08:57:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-11-30T00:00:00NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 02/19/2010 16:21:00 # Pages:1
Date: February 19, 2010WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/19/2010 16:20:00 # Pages:1
Date: February 19, 2010REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 01/28/2010 11:42:00 # Pages:2
Date: January 28, 2010DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/19/2010 16:20:00 # Pages:1
Date: February 19, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.