Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
De La Torre, Jesus V, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against De La Torre, Maria P. O., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time111 days |
MINUTE ORDER 01/19/2010 08:30:00 # Pages:2
Date: January 19, 2010REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 12/15/2009 15:58:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/15/2009 15:58:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00JUDGMENT 01/19/2010 11:03:00 # Pages:14
Date: January 19, 2010SUMMONS 09/30/2009 10:25:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 09/30/2009 10:24:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 01/19/2010 07:52:00 # Pages:4
Date: January 19, 2010MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 12/17/2009 11:08:00 # Pages:1
Date: December 17, 2009NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/30/2009 10:25:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 12/15/2009 15:58:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/15/2009 15:59:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 09/30/2009 10:25:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-09-30T00:00:00NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 01/19/2010 07:52:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 19, 2010DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/19/2010 07:53:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 19, 2010DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 01/19/2010 07:52:00 # Pages:2
Date: January 19, 2010WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/19/2010 07:52:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 19, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.