Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Schultz, Peter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2009 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Probation/Sentencing re: Violation of Probation
Judge: DeSantos, Thomas |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Probation/Sentencing re: Violation of Probation | |
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event | INFO: | |
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeSantos, Thomas |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeSantos, Thomas |
|
October 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: Schultz, Peter M. |
|
October 25, 2010 | Docket Event | INFO: | |
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event | INFO: | |
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: Bissig, Louis F. |
|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | INFO: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.