Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tapia, Miguel, Tapia, Jose Antonio, Tapia, Alvaro, Tapia, Olga Lidia, Tapia, Luis F., (total of 8) See All filed a(n) 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case against Tri-County Medical Transport, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Corona, Adolfo presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time28 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons filed Summons on Complaint filed. TLC |
|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet TLC | |
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. TLC Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet TLC | |
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Returned documents letter Documents returned: Civil Coversheet Reason: item 1 is incomplete sg |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Mgnt Conf Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 1-5-10 by SAMGARCIA |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$355.00 was made on receipt CVCE134644. |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.