Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nicole Olivares vs Marci Harness/DIS
A 22 Unlimited - Auto case was filed by Olivares, Nicole D, against Harness, Tyson, and Harness, Marci R, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Corona, Adolfo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 25, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
22 Unlimited - Auto
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year and 14 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 4 months and 16 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of dismissal filed. nm | |
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Off calendar Trial dates vacated. Entire Action Dismissed. TLC |
|
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. TLC Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
August 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement filed Notice of Settlement of entire action filed pursuant to CRC 3.1385. Dismissal to be filed by: 10/10/10 nm |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice filed Notice of change of firm and address filed. kct |
|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Alvarez, Brian |
|
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Off calendar for TRR scheduled for 1/7/10 - reset to 1/7/11. dsw | |
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Off calendar for ADR hearing scheduled for 1-28-10---ADR stip filed skp . | |
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice sent Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 24-NOV-2009 by SPALMER. |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 12-28-09----Stipulation in Lieu of CMC filed skp . | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
ADR Stipulation - Mediation ADR stipulation filed - parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James Dilling skp |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Jury requested by Defendant | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Trial Setting Case Management Conference taken off calendar. Estimated time for trial: 5 days OSC re ADR Stipulation set 1-28-10 at 9am in Dept 98B Mandatory Settlement Conference date: 12-14-10 at 10am in Dept 97C Trial Readiness date: 1-7-11 at 9:30 in Dept 97C Trial date: 1-10-11 at 9am in Dept 97C skp |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer unltd civil case filed Answer to filed. |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$710.00 was made on receipt CVCE131764. |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer unltd civil case filed Answer to Complaint filed. TLC |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration of diligence re attempted service on defendant filed. KEC |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Filed proof service by mail Summons,Complaint, ADR Package and Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes on defendant Tyson Harness, date of mailing 9-10-2009 KEC |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp personal Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing personal service on defendant on 9-9-2009 . KEC |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp - subst. Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Marci Harness, wife , mailed on 9-10-2009 . KEC |
|
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Mgnt Conf Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 25-AUG-2009 by LESPARZA. |
|
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet le | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons filed Summons on original Complaint filed. le |
|
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion le Event: Civil complaint filed |
|
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$355.00 was made on receipt CVCE129865. |