Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fetterman Baham, Valera, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by In Pro Per, against Bustos, John Byron, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Susan C. Harlan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Harassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE DESTROYED | |
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL RECEIVED: TO VALERA FETTERMAN BAHAM. RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - ORDER CLOSING CASE FILED 4/17/20 WAS MAILED TO PLAINTIFF ON 4/21/20 | |
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING CASE | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DESTROYED | |
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: JUDGE SUSAN C. HARLAN THERE ARE NO APPEARANCES. MATTER IS DROPPED FROM CALENDAR AS THERE ARE NO APPEARANCES. |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING CIVIL HARASSMENT |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: NOTICE UPON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: EX PARTE HEARING FOR TRO (HARASSMENT) Date: 12/07/2009 Time: 11:00 am Judge: HARLAN, SUSAN C Location: DEPT 2 Result: DROPPED
Judge: HARLAN, SUSAN C |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (FEE WAIVER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.