Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nco Portfolio Management, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica L., against Solimany, Simin, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Fain, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
File Destroyed Per GC 68152(d)(2) kjr |
|
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC - 3.740 Collection Case Dispo
Judge: Fain, Gregory |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Off calendar for OSC scheduled for 01/06/10 . cm | |
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Action dismissed (without) prejudice. CMdice. Event: Dismissed Case |
|
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cal Setting Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 17-JUL-2009 by PNUNO. |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conf Stmt Case Management Conference Statement filed. PSN |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CCR scheduled for 7-16-09. Set for Order to Show Cause on 1-6-10 @ 11:00am in Clovis Dept. 1 for failure to obtain judgment. psn | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Collection Case Review
Judge: Fain, Gregory |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons & comp - substituted Summons returned and filed with proof of service of summons and complaint on Simin Solimany by substituted service, mailed on 01/29/09 . cm |
|
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Col Case Review Prtd Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 02-JAN-2009 by CMOLINA. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.