Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mott, Jared D, Ponte, Caroline, C.S. Ponte Ent Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Valley Yellow Pages, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Historical Exhibit Pursuant to Government Code 68150, all exhibits on this case have been preserved by converting from paper copy to an electronic record. |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Pursuant CRC1727 temp judge Pursuant to CRC 1727 (sign posted & oral notification given), the parties are deemed to have stipulated to this matter being tried by a temporary judge. exd |
|
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 14-APR-2009 by EDUQUE. |
|
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Continued Court Trial
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by court Court orders action dismissed with prejudice. Judgment already issued in Civil Limited Case #07CL05357 exd |
|
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Minute Order Temporary Judge: George Lane Dept.: 97E Clerk: E. Duque Reporter/Tape: 11/07/09 Nature of Hearing: Court Trial Appearing parties: On behalf of the Plaintiff: Caroline Ponte On behalf of the Defendant: Fern L. Burnett |
|
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case comment Cross Reference with CASE#07CECL05357 cr |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice sent Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 10-FEB-2009 by CRODRIGUEZ. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.