Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilson, Antoinnette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lester, Marcus Earl, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1395 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time91 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Historical Documents DMS Conversion Documents |
|
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Scanned FL Ret Family Law Judgment Date:07-16-09 Scanned Date:10-25-12 jlm 10-25-12 |
|
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Archives for microfilming bzj 040109 | |
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. Marital status ends 07-16-09. bzj 040109 | |
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution __x_ Legal Separation ___ bzj 040109 Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg bzj 040109 |
|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: VR @ Facilitator's for Judgment Review. Requested by: DJS 3-17-09. MR. | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Preliminary and Final waived. djs 032409 |
|
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Marcus Earl Lester. djs 032409 | |
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of service-summons filed Proof of service of summons on Dissolution of Marriage and Blank Response, Completed and Blank Dec of Discl, SOA & Debts, IEDecl filed showing service on Marcus Earl Lester by personal service on 01-15-09. ng 01-23-09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.