Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nunez, Henry D., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Nunez, Henry D., against Cagsi International Inc, Cantu, Elaine, Servin, Gilbert, represented by Schwinn, Fred W., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Alvarez, Brian presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions332 days |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Opposition filed
Date: June 23, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: July 08, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 08, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 08, 2020Reply filed
Date: June 18, 2020Request Filed
Date: January 08, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: January 08, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 04, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: January 08, 2020Application for and Renewal of Judgment Filed
Date: December 11, 2019Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued
Date: December 05, 2019Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Application for and Renewal of Judgment Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Set Aside Judgment Henry Nunez Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed Henry D. Nunez Amended Proof of Service |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion to Set Aside or Vacate Order Granting Motion to Vacate Renewal of Judgment. |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities Henry D. Nunez Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Set Aside or Vacate Order Granting Motion to Vacate Renewal of Judgment |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Henry D. Nunez Proof of Service |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Intent to Set Aside or Vacate Order Granting Motion to Vacate Renewal of Judgment. |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Henry D. Nunez Declaration of Henry D. Nunez in Support of Motion to Set Aside or Vacate Order Granting Motion to Vacate Renewal of Judgment |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee) Motion filed to Set Aside or Vacate Order Granting Motion to Vacate Renewal of Judgment. |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Taken Under Submission or Advisement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.