Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hendryx, Patricia Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hendryx, Everette Craig, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 1985 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MINUTES & ORDER FILED 3/9/10 AS TO [R] BY MAIL 3/18/10 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF MINUTES & ORDER FILED 3/9/10 AS TO [P] BY MAIL 3/18/10 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: REQUEST FOR HEARING EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT Desc2: FILED 2/4/20 Disp Code: 340 - C/S ARREARS ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: TLC Filing Clerk: SKB Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESP DECL AUDIT SUMMARY & [R] REQ FOR HEARING AS TO PATRICIA L AMBROSE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DMY | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESP DECL AUDIT SUMMARY AS TO EVERETT C HENDRYX Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DMY | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration RESP DECL TO OSC/NTC OF MOTION [DCSS] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DMY |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Initial (DCSS Only) REQUEST FOR HEARING RE EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SKB |
|
May 07, 1993 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [R] MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR PER RESP Disp Clerk: DKM Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Judge, Sitting (Department 2) |
|
April 23, 1993 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [R] MTN FOR MOD OF C/S Disp Code: 906 - CONT TO 05-07-93 BY STIPULATION Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: SNY Judge: Judge, Sitting (Department 4) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.