We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Ryan Seibert ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
84 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Case Cycle Time
1809 days
Case Events for
Capital One Bank v. Ryan Seibert
Date
Type
Description
September 29, 2012
Docket Event
TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.
May 20, 2010
Docket Event
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 05/20/2010
Get Document
May 14, 2008
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/14/2008 AT 13:30:00 IN WJC AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER
March 03, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10064661 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 89046.
Get Document
March 01, 2008
Docket Event
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT
January 09, 2008
Docket Event
CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.
January 09, 2008
Docket Event
JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/09/2008
Get Document
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: UNDERLYING ACTION OF ACCOUNT STATED) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/31/2007
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: INTEREST) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/31/2007
December 31, 2007
Docket Event
DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/31/2007
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.