Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Paul Tran, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Tim Tran, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 20, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions34 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1809 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2012 | Docket Event | TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012. | |
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TRAN, PAUL ON 12/11/2007 | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING. | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10009562 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 34015. | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY TRAN, PAUL ON 11/20/2007 | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TRAN, PAUL ON 11/20/2007 | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TRAN, PAUL ON 11/20/2007 | |
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY TRAN, PAUL ON 11/20/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.