Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lee, Ho Ung filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2007 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time274 days |
MINUTE ORDER 01/10/2008 08:45:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 10, 2008DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 12/20/2007 14:18:00 # Pages:4
Date: December 20, 2007STIPULATION - COMMISSIONER 01/10/2008 16:17:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 10, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE 01/08/2008 09:24:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 08, 2008REQUEST - DISMISSAL - GRANTED - FULL CASE 09/19/2008 14:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: September 19, 2008DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/20/2007 14:17:00 # Pages:5
Date: December 20, 2007NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/20/2007 14:19:00 # Pages:1
Date: December 20, 2007DECLARATION - NOTICE - EX PARTE 12/20/2007 14:19:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-20T00:00:00DV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING 01/10/2008 13:43:00 # Pages:5
Date: January 10, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.