We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
|
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
|
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections
|
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
|
|
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
1496 days
|
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
|
|
Case Cycle Time
2083 days
|
Case Events for
Chase V Kirlin
Date |
Type |
Description |
|
June 30, 2013 |
Docket Event |
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
|
|
November 21, 2011 |
Docket Event |
ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION ON 11/21/2011
|
|
November 21, 2011 |
Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
|
|
November 21, 2011 |
Docket Event |
COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
|
|
November 21, 2011 |
Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION ON 11/21/2011
|
|
April 16, 2008 |
Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/16/2008 AT 13:30:00 IN HLH AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS
|
|
November 14, 2007 |
Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/09/2012 AT 01:30:00 PM IN S09 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.
|
|
November 09, 2007 |
Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION ON 11/09/2007
|
|
November 07, 2007 |
Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION ON 11/07/2007
|
|
October 17, 2007 |
Docket Event |
COMPLAINT - COLLECTION 3.740 (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION ON 10/17/2007
|
|
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.