Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Integrated Asset Services, Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Gerardo Moreno, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 14, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2083 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/29/2008 AT 13:30:00 IN HLH AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS | |
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY INTEGRATED ASSET SERVICES, INC ON 12/19/2007 | |
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10012269 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 36722. | |
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY. FORWARDED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK. | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (INCLUDES ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS) FILED BY INTEGRATED ASSET SERVICES, INC ON 12/05/2007 | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY. INCLUDES ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS) FILED BY INTEGRATED ASSET SERVICES, INC ON 12/05/2007 | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | DRAP UD DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY INTEGRATED ASSET SERVICES, INC ON 12/05/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.