Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2083 days |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 02/07/2008
Date: 2008-02-07T00:00:00WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/16/2009
Date: June 16, 2009NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/19/2008
Date: June 19, 2008JUDGMENT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 02/06/2008
Date: 2008-02-06T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 02/07/2008
Date: 2008-02-07T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 09/21/2009
Date: September 21, 2009DECLARATION - OTHER (RE:CCP 1033;INTEREST CALCULATIONS;COSTS) FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 02/07/2008
Date: 2008-02-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.