Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Michael A. Leversen presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 10, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Commercial |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions150 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1876 days |
MOTION - OTHER (STAY ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 01/07/2008
Date: 2008-01-07T00:00:00JUDGMENT (ON SPECIAL VERDICT) FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 01/07/2008
Date: 2008-01-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 01/07/2008 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2008-01-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 01/14/2008 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 01/09/2008
Date: 2008-01-09T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 01/14/2008
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 02/11/2008
Date: 2008-02-11T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 01/03/2008
Date: 2008-01-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING OR CONTINUANCE
Date: 2008-02-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 01/17/2008
Date: 2008-01-17T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 01/22/2008
Date: 2008-01-22T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 01/10/2008
Date: 2008-01-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 01/09/2008
Date: 2008-01-09T00:00:00MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL FILED BY U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Date: 2008-02-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 02/28/2008
Date: 2008-02-28T00:00:00NOTICE TO FILING PARTY.
Date: 2008-05-06T00:00:00NOTICE RE: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT SENT TO COURT REPORTER. (RESPONDENT)
Date: 2008-05-05T00:00:00MOTION TO VACATE (JUDGMENT) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 07/30/2008
Date: 2008-07-30T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER (WITHDRAWAL OF EX PARTE) FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 08/18/2008
Date: 2008-08-18T00:00:00ESTIMATE OF COSTS RECEIVED FROM COURT REPORTER FOR RESPONDENT.
Date: 2008-05-23T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 08/19/2008
Date: 2008-08-19T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/07/2008
Date: 2008-08-07T00:00:00RECORD ON APPEAL CIVIL CASE INDEX FORM -ALPHABETICAL GENERATED
Date: 2008-09-04T00:00:00ESTIMATE OF COSTS RECEIVED FROM COURT REPORTER FOR APPELLANT.
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 08/07/2008 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2008-08-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO VACATE 08/21/2008 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2008-08-21T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER RECEIVED FROM APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2008-05-27T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 02/25/2008
Date: 2008-02-25T00:00:00AMENDED DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY BREA PARTNERS.
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 02/04/2008
Date: 2008-02-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 03/25/2008
Date: 2008-03-25T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL MAILED.
Date: 2008-03-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF ESTIMATED COSTS OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT MAILED. APPELLANT
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00LETTER RE: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT.
Date: 2008-07-23T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (CLERK'S/REPORTER'S) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 04/04/2008
Date: 2008-04-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 08/28/2008
Date: 2008-08-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL 02/28/2008 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2008-03-04T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER RECEIVED FROM APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2008-05-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF ESTIMATED COSTS OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT MAILED. RESPONDENT
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00NOTICE RE: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT SENT TO COURT REPORTER.
Date: 2008-04-17T00:00:00LETTER FILED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN.
Date: 2008-06-11T00:00:00NOTICE RE: FEE PREPARATION OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT MAILED.
Date: 2008-07-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL 02/28/2008 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2008-02-29T00:00:00RECORD ON APPEAL CIVIL CASE INDEX FORM -CHRONOLOGICAL GENERATED
Date: 2008-09-04T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/14/2008
Date: 2008-08-14T00:00:00LETTER FILED BY U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT.
Date: 2008-04-28T00:00:00NOTICE TO FILING PARTY.
Date: 2008-04-18T00:00:00APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 08/19/2008
Date: 2008-08-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL MAILED.
Date: 2008-08-12T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 08/08/2008
Date: 2008-08-08T00:00:00NOTICE RE: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT COST SENT TO COURT REPORTER.
Date: 2008-09-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF ESTIMATED COSTS OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT MAILED.
Date: 2008-10-10T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL MAILED.
Date: 2008-09-04T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER RECEIVED FROM APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2008-11-04T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORD AND PAPERS RECEIVED FROM APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2008-10-15T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 07/20/2009
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00SIGNED RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS RETURNED TO APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2009-07-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING (LAW AND MOTION) FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 07/29/2009
Date: 2009-07-29T00:00:00OBJECTION (TO EVIDENCE) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/04/2009
Date: August 04, 2009CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2008-12-02T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER RECEIVED FROM APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2009-06-30T00:00:00CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2008-09-04T00:00:00NOTICE RE: FEE PREPARATION OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT MAILED.
Date: 2008-10-28T00:00:00RECORD ON APPEAL CIVIL CASE INDEX FORM -CHRONOLOGICAL GENERATED
Date: 2008-09-09T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (CLERK'S/REPORTER'S) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 09/15/2008
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00ESTIMATE OF COSTS RECEIVED FROM COURT REPORTER.
Date: 2008-10-10T00:00:00JUDGMENT RECEIVED FROM APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER RECEIVED FROM APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2009-05-27T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORD RECEIVED.
Date: 2008-12-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL (2ND APPEAL) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 09/03/2008
Date: 2008-09-03T00:00:00DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (RESPONDENT) FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 09/18/2008
Date: 2008-09-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 08/20/2009
Date: August 20, 2009NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF TRANCRIPT ON APPEAL MAILED.
Date: 2008-11-10T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/04/2009
Date: 2009-08-04T00:00:00REMITTITUR RECEIVED FROM APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/05/2009
Date: August 05, 2009SIGNED RECEIPT FOR REMITTITUR SENT TO APPELLATE DIVISION.
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00RECEIPT - OTHER (FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 09/28/2012
Date: September 28, 2012APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES (CITIED IN OPPOSITION) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 08/04/2009
Date: 2009-08-04T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CALIFORNIA BREA PARTNERS, LP ON 08/10/2009
Date: August 10, 2009NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS
Date: August 14, 2012RULING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES HEARD ON 8-17-09
Date: August 17, 2009MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 08/17/2009 10:00:00 AM.
Date: August 17, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.