Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Roger B. Robbins presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management161 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions406 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2321 days |
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 05/30/2008 09:00:00 AM.
Date: May 30, 2008DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AUTOMOTIVE FUNDING GROUP,INC. ON 04/24/2008
Date: April 24, 2008MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY AUTOMOTIVE FUNDING GROUP,INC. ON 04/24/2008
Date: 2008-04-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 01/14/2008 09:40:00 AM.
Date: 2008-02-05T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY AUTOMOTIVE FUNDING GROUP,INC. ON 01/14/2008
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY AUTOMOTIVE FUNDING GROUP,INC. ON 04/02/2008
Date: 2008-04-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 01/14/2008 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AUTOMOTIVE FUNDING GROUP,INC. ON 04/24/2008
Date: 2008-04-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/05/2008 03:44:04 PM.
Date: 2008-02-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: 2008-02-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.