Beneficial California Inc,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
against
Frank Villa,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Beneficial California Inc v. Frank Villa
Case Events for
Beneficial California Inc v. Frank Villa
Date
Type
Description
June 30, 2013
Docket Event
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
February 10, 2011
Docket Event
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC ON 02/10/2011
November 15, 2010
Docket Event
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC ON 11/15/2010
May 24, 2010
Docket Event
WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC ON 05/24/2010
May 18, 2010
Docket Event
NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.
May 15, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10116648 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 141014.
May 14, 2008
Docket Event
WRIT ISSUED FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY.
April 18, 2008
Docket Event
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC ON 04/18/2008
April 14, 2008
Docket Event
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/14/2008 AT 13:30:00 IN HNB AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH
March 27, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10082400 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 106767.