Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
County Of Orange, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Dcss, against Juarez, Gilbert Jay, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryPaternity - Department Of Chil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions445 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypePaternity |
|
Case Cycle Time1696 days |
MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 06/09/2009 14:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-06-09T00:00:00SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 10/29/2007 09:43:00 # Pages:10
Date: 2007-10-29T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/11/2009 08:38:00 # Pages:4
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00MOTION - MODIFICATION 03/11/2009 08:38:00 **TELEPHONIC HRG. # Pages:4
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT - GOVT 01/16/2009 08:14:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-01-16T00:00:00JUDGMENT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 01/16/2009 08:16:00 # Pages:7
Date: 2009-01-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 01/16/2009 08:16:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-01-16T00:00:00NOTICE - PRODUCE AND APPEAR 03/11/2009 08:39:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/23/2012 14:39:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 23, 2012MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 09/01/2009 13:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-09-01T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/23/2012 14:44:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 23, 2012MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 12/15/2009 14:00:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/25/2012 09:01:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 25, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/25/2012 12:02:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 25, 2012RFO - MODIFICATION 05/07/2012 09:14:00 # Pages:4
Date: May 07, 2012NOTICE - REGISTRATION OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER 05/07/2012 15:20:00 # Pages:16
Date: 2012-05-07T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/07/2012 09:54:00 # Pages:4
Date: 2012-05-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/23/2012 14:43:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 23, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/30/2012 09:19:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 30, 2012MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 06/20/2012 08:00:00 # Pages:1
Date: June 20, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.