Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Parks, Terry Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lee, Olivian, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time373 days |
JUDGMENT 03/28/2008 11:24:00 # Pages:2
Date: March 28, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/28/2008 11:25:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 28, 2008NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/31/2007 10:40:00 # Pages:1
Date: December 31, 2007NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/28/2008 11:25:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 28, 2008DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/28/2008 11:25:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 28, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/04/2008 11:52:00 # Pages:2
Date: March 04, 2008EX PARTE APPLICATION - RESTORATION FORMER NAME 01/07/2009 14:23:00 # Pages:1
Date: January 07, 2009REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 03/28/2008 11:26:00 # Pages:2
Date: March 28, 2008PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/31/2007 10:39:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS 12/31/2007 10:40:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.