Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Salcido Jr, Jim P, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Salcido, Marcella, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions165 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time165 days |
DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/31/2007 11:36:00 # Pages:3
Date: December 31, 2007NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/31/2007 11:37:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT 06/13/2008 14:55:00 # Pages:22
Date: June 13, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/02/2008 11:33:00 # Pages:2
Date: June 02, 2008SUMMONS 12/31/2007 11:36:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/13/2008 14:57:00 # Pages:1
Date: June 13, 2008REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 06/02/2008 11:32:00 # Pages:2
Date: June 02, 2008NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 06/02/2008 11:33:00 # Pages:1
Date: June 02, 2008PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/31/2007 11:36:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.