Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Zheng, Fang, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shen, Xuefeng, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions136 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1005 days |
PROPERTY DECLARATION 12/31/2007 11:09:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/09/2010 10:52:00 # Pages:1
Date: August 09, 2010NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/16/2008 15:46:00 # Pages:1
Date: May 16, 2008SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 02/05/2010 14:28:00 # Pages:2
Date: February 05, 2010DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/26/2008 14:46:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-02-26T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 05/15/2008 13:15:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-05-15T00:00:00DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 08/09/2010 10:52:00 # Pages:2
Date: August 09, 2010NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/31/2007 11:09:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/31/2007 11:08:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/14/2008 11:53:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-03-14T00:00:00SUMMONS 12/31/2007 11:08:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 03/14/2008 11:53:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-03-14T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/31/2007 11:08:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00PROPERTY DECLARATION 12/31/2007 11:09:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 04/17/2008 08:15:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-04-17T00:00:00STIPULATION - TEMPORARY JUDGE 05/15/2008 14:10:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-05-15T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 10/01/2010 14:36:00 # Pages:2
Date: October 01, 2010JUDGMENT 05/15/2008 15:46:00 # Pages:8
Date: 2008-05-15T00:00:00NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/09/2010 10:52:00 # Pages:1
Date: August 09, 2010JUDGMENT 08/09/2010 10:51:00 # Pages:11
Date: August 09, 2010WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/09/2010 10:52:00 # Pages:1
Date: August 09, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.