Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vega, Victor, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Farris, William E, against Vega, Mariel, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time81 days |
REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 03/17/2008 16:36:00 # Pages:2
Date: March 17, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/17/2008 16:36:00 # Pages:2
Date: March 17, 2008WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/21/2008 11:42:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 21, 2008NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/21/2008 11:43:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 21, 2008NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/31/2007 10:52:00 # Pages:1
Date: December 31, 2007PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/31/2007 10:52:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS 12/31/2007 10:52:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT 03/21/2008 11:41:00 # Pages:8
Date: March 21, 2008NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 03/17/2008 16:37:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 17, 2008DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/21/2008 11:42:00 # Pages:1
Date: March 21, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.