Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Krier, Michael J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Robinson, Kevin Eugene, against Krier, Victoria A, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 20, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions293 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time293 days |
SUMMONS 12/20/2007 11:05:00 # Pages:2
Date: December 20, 2007DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/08/2008 08:04:00 # Pages:2
Date: October 08, 2008PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/20/2007 11:05:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-20T00:00:00WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/08/2008 08:04:00 # Pages:1
Date: October 08, 2008DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/08/2008 08:04:00 # Pages:1
Date: October 08, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 01/18/2008 15:54:00 # Pages:2
Date: January 18, 2008DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/01/2008 12:37:00 # Pages:1
Date: April 01, 2008REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 10/08/2008 08:05:00 # Pages:2
Date: October 08, 2008NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/20/2007 11:06:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-20T00:00:00JUDGMENT 10/08/2008 08:04:00 # Pages:17
Date: October 08, 2008NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/08/2008 08:06:00 # Pages:1
Date: October 08, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.