Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barton, Michael James, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barton, Carla, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with MILLARD, MARK S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 20, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Without Child |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions251 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time586 days |
SUMMONS 12/20/2007 10:56:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-20T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/28/2007 09:25:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER 12/28/2007 09:14:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00OSC - OTHER 12/28/2007 09:12:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE 01/11/2008 08:52:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-01-11T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER 12/28/2007 09:25:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/28/2007 14:11:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00DECLARATION - NOTICE - EX PARTE 12/28/2007 10:48:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/20/2007 10:57:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-20T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER 12/28/2007 09:14:00 PROPOSED # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00DECLARATION - NOTICE - EX PARTE 12/28/2007 09:14:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/28/2007 10:46:00 # Pages:5
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 12/28/2007 10:47:00 # Pages:6
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00DV REQUEST - CONTINUE COURT HEARING & ISSUE TRO 01/17/2008 08:24:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-01-17T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/26/2007 14:43:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-26T00:00:00PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/20/2007 10:56:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2007-12-20T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 01/16/2008 08:24:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-01-16T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/28/2007 10:48:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY STIPULATION 01/17/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-01-17T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER 04/04/2008 12:53:00 # Pages:10
Date: 2008-04-04T00:00:00SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - BRIEF / STATEMENT 07/29/2008 12:28:00 # Pages:10
Date: 2008-07-29T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 02/11/2008 10:12:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-02-11T00:00:00OTHER 02/14/2008 08:55:00 DV120, ITEM 19 MORE INFO # Pages:6
Date: 2008-02-14T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER 07/31/2008 14:04:00 # Pages:19
Date: July 31, 2008INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/03/2008 10:40:00 # Pages:4
Date: 2008-03-03T00:00:00DV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING 02/21/2008 10:21:00 # Pages:5
Date: 2008-02-21T00:00:00DV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 02/14/2008 08:48:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2008-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 05/05/2008 10:34:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-05-05T00:00:00STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/28/2008 11:29:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00NOTICE - RULING 04/09/2008 12:29:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2008-04-09T00:00:00NOTICE - TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 04/18/2008 14:59:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-04-18T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 02/21/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2008-02-21T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/29/2008 12:29:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-07-29T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/27/2008 15:36:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-03-27T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 08/05/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:2
Date: August 05, 2008WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 09/22/2008 11:21:00 # Pages:2
Date: September 22, 2008MINUTE ORDER 04/04/2008 08:35:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-04-04T00:00:00JUDGMENT 08/27/2008 16:00:00 # Pages:7
Date: August 27, 2008INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/01/2008 16:25:00 # Pages:8
Date: 2008-02-01T00:00:00AT-ISSUE 04/02/2008 08:18:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-04-02T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/25/2008 14:03:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-01-25T00:00:00RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 03/26/2008 12:52:00 # Pages:8
Date: 2008-03-26T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/17/2008 14:02:00 # Pages:7
Date: 2008-07-17T00:00:00RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/24/2008 16:30:00 # Pages:4
Date: 2008-01-24T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY STIPULATION 01/28/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:2
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/17/2008 12:03:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-03-17T00:00:00RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/25/2008 14:02:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2008-01-25T00:00:00DV PROOF - SERVICE BY MAIL 02/15/2008 09:26:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-02-15T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER 03/20/2008 14:14:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2008-03-20T00:00:00MOTION - RECONSIDERATION 03/03/2008 10:39:00 # Pages:4
Date: 2008-03-03T00:00:00DV REQUEST - CONTINUE COURT HEARING & ISSUE TRO 01/28/2008 08:17:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 07/28/2009 15:44:00 # Pages:2
Date: July 28, 2009DV PROOF - SERVICE BY MAIL 07/17/2008 13:55:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-07-17T00:00:00DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/17/2008 14:03:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-07-17T00:00:00SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - BRIEF / STATEMENT 07/17/2008 14:03:00 # Pages:4
Date: 2008-07-17T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/29/2008 12:29:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2008-07-29T00:00:00STIPULATION - JUDGMENT 08/05/2008 12:28:00 # Pages:5
Date: August 05, 2008DECLARATION - OTHER 07/31/2008 14:04:00 # Pages:3
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 06/03/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:1
Date: 2008-06-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/05/2008 12:29:00 # Pages:1
Date: August 05, 2008NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/27/2008 16:00:00 # Pages:1
Date: August 27, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.